Original Case: 8:10-cv-01958

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv.pr-02149
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2013
Terminated:Jun 06, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 9:39 PM EST
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant
GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant
GEICO CORPORATION
Defendant - Appellee
GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Eric Hemmendinger
SHAWE & ROSENTHAL, LLP
contact info
Pratik A. Shah
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Eric Hemmendinger
SHAWE & ROSENTHAL, LLP
contact info
Pratik A. Shah
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LAVERNE HOLMES
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LEAH HAMILTON
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RANDALL STEWART
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL RUSSELL
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOPHER SULLIVAN
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS STURGIS
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RICKY MCCRACKEN
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH MILES, JR.
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EBERHARD GROSSER
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DENNIS FULTON
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICK WEISE
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS DAVIDSON, JR.
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANNON BOYD
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY DEAN, JR.
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRANCISCO NOGALES
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN GHETTI
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GERALD DEXTER
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLAUDE REIHER
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEVEN MCBRIDE
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL BROWN
Plaintiff - Appellant
PHILLIP RONDELLO
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT MERRY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIAM DOLINSKY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL HEADLEY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AARON KULSIC
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KENNETH MILLER
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL CREAMER
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GEORGE WOOD
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT DEMARTINO
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN HALLIDAY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES L. HANSON
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS F. BRADY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DANA FERRIN
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MAUREEN AYLING
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CANDIDO CUBERO
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS FITZGERALD
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SAMUEL CALDERON, individually and on behalf of other similarly situated individuals
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARVIN HOURIGAN
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID MCCAMLEY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AUGUSTUS STANSBURY, JR.
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOAN BISCHOFF
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RANDALL GIBSON
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VINCENT GRECO
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERESA HARTEY-ADAMETZ
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS LOWE
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID MCENRY
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JENNIFER RICCA
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANITA SINGH
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRYAN UTTERBACK
Represented By
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2014
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. [999370950]. [13-2096, 13-2149]

Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 8:43 PM EST
Wednesday, September 18, 2013
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. Case manager: SWiley. 13-2149 (SAW)
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. Mailed to: S. Hora, P. Lukas. 13-2149 (SAW)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER filed [999196024] consolidating case 13-2149 with 13-2096 Cross-appeal appellant: GEICO General Insurance Co., et. al.. Consolidation after briefing in all cases complete? no. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: S. Hora, P. Lukas. 13-2096 13-2149 (SAW)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER filed [999196040] rescinding briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: S. Hora, P. Lukas. 13-2096 (SAW)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: GEICO General Insurance Co., et. al. Mailed to: S. Hora, P. Lukas. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/28/2013. Opening/Response Brief Due: 12/02/2013. Response/Reply Brief Due 01/02/2014. 13-2096 13-2149 (SAW)
Related: [-]