Imperial Palms Resort, LLC v. Readshaw
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-04553
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-04553
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Margaret M Mann |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-90007 |
Nature of Suit | 81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Darryll Readshaw, Defendant
7160 Caminito Pepino
La Jolla, CA 92037 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiffs
Imperial Palms Resort, LLC, Plaintiff
SMAHA LAW GROUP 2398 San Diego Avenue
San Diego, CA 92110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Closed Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/22 1:49 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (Cruz, L.) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Fri 05/11 9:17 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Parties Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7041-2 (Notice) (CSD 3053)(BNC)
Wed 05/09 3:55 PM
Notice to Parties Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7041-2. (Cruz, L.) |
|
Saturday, April 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Sat 04/14 12:12 PM
Stipulation To Extend Deadline For Filing Response To Debtor's Adversary Complaint filed by Wolfgang F. Hahn on behalf of Darryll Readshaw. (Hahn, Wolfgang) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
~Generic~ Order
Wed 03/28 2:22 PM
Order Regarding Plaintiff Imperial Palm's Resort and Defendant Darryl Readshaw's Stipulation ; with BNC Service signed on 3/28/2018. (Cruz, L.) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/26 10:25 AM
Stipulation Extending Deadline for Filing Answer or other Response to Complaint filed by Wolfgang F. Hahn on behalf of Darryll Readshaw. (Hahn, Wolfgang) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Return of Summons Served
Fri 03/02 8:36 AM
Alias Summons Served on: Darryll Readshaw and Darryll Readshaw c/o Wolfgang F. Hahn. Served On 03/01/2018 filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Alias Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (Auto)
Thu 03/01 1:54 PM
|
|
10 | 10
cmp
Issuance of Alias Summons (Request)(CSD 2500A) (paperless entry)
Thu 03/01 1:54 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Deficiencies in Request to Enter Default (Notification) (CSD 3031)(BNC)
Wed 02/28 1:59 PM
Notification of Deficiencies in Request to Enter Default. (Cruz, L.) |
|
8 | 8
ans
Declaration
Wed 02/28 9:23 AM
Amended Declaration of John L. Smaha in Support of Entry of Default Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1 filed by John L. Smaha of Smaha Law Group, APC on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default (Request)(CSD 3030)
Tue 02/27 3:38 PM
Request to Enter Default with Declaration of Mailing, Memorandum of Costs and if applicable Declaration of Non- Military Status. filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Smaha | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiencies in Request to Enter Default (Notification) (CSD 3031)(BNC)
Tue 02/27 3:02 PM
Notification of Deficiencies in Request to Enter Default. (Cruz, L.) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default (Request)(CSD 3030)
Mon 02/26 3:15 PM
Request to Enter Default with Declaration of Mailing, Memorandum of Costs and if applicable Declaration of Non- Military Status. filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Smaha | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Return of Summons Served
Fri 01/26 11:27 AM
Summons Served on: Wolfgang F. Hahn. Served On 01/26/2018 filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) Modified on 1/26/2018 (Cruz, L.) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Wed 01/24 3:13 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-90007 MM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 350.00 Receipt number A13763962 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto)
Wed 01/24 3:11 PM
Summons Issued on Darryl Readshaw Answer Due 02/23/2018; with Certificate of Service. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 01/24 3:11 PM
Adversary case 18-90007 Complaint by Imperial Palms Resort, LLC against Darryl Readshaw. Nature of Suit: 81 (Subordination of claim or interest) 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) 12 13 , Fee Amount $ 350.00 Filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |