Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50209
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Aug 10, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Averitt Express, Inc.
Represented By
Averitt Express, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, August 10, 2018
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/10 12:24 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/10 3:35 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50209 Closed (Mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
16 16 notice Service - Notice Fri 06/29 4:52 PM
Notice of Service regarding (i) Defendant's First Request for Admissions, (ii) Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and (iii) Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents Filed by Averitt Express, Inc. (Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Service - Notice Fri 06/29 3:49 PM
Notice of Service regarding Averitt Express' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Hancock Fabrics, Inc.'s Request for Admission Filed by Averitt Express, Inc. (Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Tue 05/29 2:30 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
11 11 utility Corrective Entry Fri 04/06 10:55 AM
Corrective Entry ~ To add correct image of order Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, April 05, 2018
10 10 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:24 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
8 8 misc Exhibit Thu 03/22 4:48 PM
Exhibit(s) B to Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Averitt Express, Inc.. (Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 16, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/16 5:23 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Averitt Express, Inc. Mediation due date: 07/16/2018.(Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
6 6 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
5 5 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 03/02 1:30 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Henry C. Shelton, III, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 3/2/2018. (JMW)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, February 19, 2018
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 02/19 12:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Henry C. Shelton, III . Receipt Number 3112325267, Filed by Averitt Express, Inc.. (Waxman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 3:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Averitt Express, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50209 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740855, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 3:44 PM
Adversary case 18-50209 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Averitt Express, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives