Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50220
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Jul 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Represented By
Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, July 20, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/20 9:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50220 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 07/19 10:55 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/09 12:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC Mediation due date: 09/6/2018.(Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 07, 2018
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
8 8 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:12 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
6 6 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 03/13 10:19 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
4 4 motion Stipulation Mon 03/12 3:10 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Between Hancock Fabrics, Inc. and Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC . Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:03 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50220 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740855, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 4:12 PM
Adversary case 18-50220 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives