Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50227
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Mar 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Indeed, Inc.
Represented By
Indeed, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, May 07, 2018
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/15 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50227 Closed (MML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 03/14 4:51 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Indeed, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50227 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740855, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 4:23 PM
Adversary case 18-50227 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Indeed, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives