Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50228
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Oct 16, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
J & B Services, Inc.
Represented By
J & B Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/16 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50228 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/15 2:33 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Wed 08/29 9:01 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to J & B Services, Inc's, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 06/29 2:13 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production of Documents Propounded to Plaintiff Filed by J & B Services, Inc. (Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 06/25 5:41 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
13 13 notice Service - Notice Fri 05/11 9:49 AM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures of J & B Services, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7026 Filed by J & B Services, Inc. (Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
10 10 utility Corrective Entry Fri 04/06 11:30 AM
Corrective Entry ~ To add correct image of order Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, April 05, 2018
9 9 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:24 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
7 7 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
6 6 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/13 12:22 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of David W. Houston, III, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 3/13/2018. (JMW)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, March 09, 2018
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 03/09 2:08 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David W. Houston, III . Receipt Number 2338224, Filed by J & B Services, Inc.. (Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/09 1:58 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by J & B Services, Inc. Mediation due date: 07/9/2018.(Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:10 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant J & B Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50228 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740855, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 4:25 PM
Adversary case 18-50228 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against J & B Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives