Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50230
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Sep 12, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Paul Colbath
Represented By
John Paul Colbath
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/12 3:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50230 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/31 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/31 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
13 13 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Tue 08/28 4:38 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant John Paul Colbath aka John Colbath Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/11/2018. Signed on 8/28/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 10
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Tue 08/28 4:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant John Paul Colbath aka John Colbath Related [+]. Signed on 8/28/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, August 24, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/24 1:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 08/24 1:04 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] 9 9
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 08/24 1:03 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Monday, May 07, 2018
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
6 6 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:12 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:12 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant John Paul Colbath. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50230 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740855, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 4:28 PM
Adversary case 18-50230 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against John Paul Colbath. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives