Hancock Fabrics, Inc. v. Premier Prints, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50247 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Premier Prints, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 05/23 10:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50247 Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Corrective Entry
Fri 04/06 11:44 AM
Corrective Entry ~ To add correct image of order (LCN) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Premier Prints, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/31 6:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50247 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8740896, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-50247 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Premier Prints, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |