Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50256
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Nov 19, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Singer Sewing Company
Represented By
Singer Sewing Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, November 19, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/19 2:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50256 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/15 3:52 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 12, 2018
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 11/12 1:25 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
24 24 mediation Conflict Review Fri 11/09 11:53 AM
Conflict Review Pursuant to Local Rule 9019-2(e)(iii)(B) (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/01 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, October 29, 2018
22 22 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 10/29 2:53 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Eric Haber is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 10/29/2018. (LH)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, October 26, 2018
21 21 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 10/26 12:04 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
20 20 utility Corrective Entry Wed 09/26 4:41 PM
Corrective Entry "EXHIBIT 1 ATTACHED" Related [+] (Mml)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/26 4:21 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time for Parties to Respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Order Signed on 9/26/2018 (Mml) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018 (Mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
18 18 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 08/30 1:13 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Defendant Singer Sewing Company's Responses and Objections to First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Singer Sewing Company (McDaniel, Garvan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
17 17 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 08/20 10:51 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Singer Sewing Company's 1st Set of Requests for Admissions Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 06/28 9:47 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery (Amended Initial Disclosures) Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Tue 06/19 3:11 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Defendant's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Filed by Singer Sewing Company (McDaniel, Garvan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
14 14 notice Service - Notice Fri 06/08 2:01 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Singer Sewing Company (McDaniel, Garvan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
13 13 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Tue 05/29 1:26 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/10 1:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Singer Sewing Company Mediation due date: 09/7/2018.(Hogan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 07, 2018
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
9 9 utility Corrective Entry Fri 04/06 11:50 AM
Corrective Entry ~ To add correct image of order Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, April 05, 2018
8 8 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:24 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
6 6 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 03/12 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Singer Sewing Company (McDaniel, Garvan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 03/12 11:34 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order with Stipulation
misc Add Attorney Mon 03/12 2:24 PM
Attorney Michele L. Angell and Garvan F. McDaniel for Singer Sewing Company, Seth A. Moskowitz and Garvan F. McDaniel for Singer Sewing Company added to case Filed by Singer Sewing Company. (McDaniel, Garvan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Singer Sewing Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 01, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/01 6:20 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50256 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8741069, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 5:35 PM
Adversary case 18-50256 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Singer Sewing Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives