Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50260
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Mar 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.
Represented By
Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 07, 2018
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/20 11:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50260 Closed (MML)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 03/16 11:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 4:58 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 01, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/01 6:20 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50260 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8741069, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 5:40 PM
Adversary case 18-50260 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives