Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50270
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Jun 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
WestRock RKT Company
Represented By
WestRock RKT Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, June 15, 2018
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal - Notice Fri 06/15 12:36 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Tickle due by: 6/29/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/15 3:41 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50270 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
10 10 motion Stipulation Wed 05/09 11:09 AM
Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Hancock Fabrics, Inc. and Westrock RKT Company . Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
7 7 utility Corrective Entry Fri 04/06 12:58 PM
Corrective Entry ~ To add correct image of order Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, April 05, 2018
6 6 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:24 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 5:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant WestRock RKT Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/13/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 01, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/01 6:20 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50270 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8741069, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 6:04 PM
Adversary case 18-50270 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against WestRock RKT Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives