Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50271
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2018
Terminated:Oct 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wiese USA, Inc.
Represented By
Wiese USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, October 05, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/05 8:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50271 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/04 1:45 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 04, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/05 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/04/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, August 02, 2018
10 10 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Thu 08/02 9:58 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Evan T. Miller is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 8/2/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
9 9 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Wed 08/01 3:34 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/10 4:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wiese USA, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/7/2018.(Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 07, 2018
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/07 11:31 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
5 5 9 pgs order Order Thu 04/05 8:12 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 4/4/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel re: Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
3 3 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc., Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/01 6:20 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50271 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8741069, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 01/31 6:05 PM
Adversary case 18-50271 Complaint by Hancock Fabrics, Inc. against Wiese USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/1/2018. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives