Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-04269
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2013
Terminated:Feb 11, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 6:38 PM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kevin S. Reed
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert LLP
contact info
David S. Hoffner
Hoffner PLLC
contact info
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 5:08 PM EST
Monday, November 04, 2013
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1086743] 13-4269 [Entered: 11/07/2013 12:36 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/03/2013, RECEIVED.[1086749] 13-4269 [Entered: 11/07/2013 12:38 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1086942] 13-4269 [Entered: 11/07/2013 02:17 PM]
Related: [-]