Original Case: 3:15-cv-00785

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-00357
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2018
Terminated:Apr 01, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2019 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Foundation Capital Partners LLC, Foundation Managing Member LLC
Represented By
Andrea Christine Sisca
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dean Barr
Represented By
Peter Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Meehan
Represented By
Jonathan Paul Whitcomb
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas Ward
Represented By
Stephen G. Walko
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara, LLC
contact info
Andrea Christine Sisca
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Elmlinger
Represented By
Stephen Joseph Arena
Trachtenberg Rodes & Friedberg LLP
contact info
David G. Trachtenberg
Trachtenberg Rodes & Friedberg LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Foundation Capital Partners LLC, FKA Foundation Managing Member LLC
Plaintiff - Appellant
FIH, LLC
Represented By
Ben Hutman
Sadis & Goldberg, LLP
contact info
Samuel J. Lieberman
Sadis & Goldberg, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 01 2019
OPINION, vacating the district court judgment and remanding for further proceedings, by DJ, GEL, VILARDO, FILED.[2529389] [18-357]

Docket last updated: 04/03/2019 4:28 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant FIH, LLC, FILED. [2231469] [18-357] [Entered: 02/07/2018 03:57 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 21 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, dated 01/31/2018, RECEIVED.[2231474] [18-357] [Entered: 02/07/2018 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/01/2018, RECEIVED.[2231476] [18-357] [Entered: 02/07/2018 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant FIH, LLC, district court receipt # ACTDC-4709544, FILED.[2231479] [18-357] [Entered: 02/07/2018 04:00 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2231483] [18-357] [Entered: 02/07/2018 04:01 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 46 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED