Connecticut District Court
Judge:Janet Bond Arterton
Referred: Joan G Margolis
Case #: 3:15-cv-00785
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Case Filed:May 22, 2015
Re-opened:Apr 23, 2019
Terminated:Jan 09, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 18, 2015 9:06 AM EST
Defendant
Dean Barr
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, Llp - Nh
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Elmlinger
Represented By
Andrew M. Zeitlin
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
David G. Trachtenberg
Trachtenberg Rodes & Friedberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Foundation Capital Partners LLC
Defendant
Joseph Meehan
Represented By
Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni, LLP
contact info
Jane Catherine Christie
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni, LLP
contact info
Thomas P. O'Dea, Jr.
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Ward
Represented By
Andrea Christine Sisca
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara LLC
contact info
Stephen George Walko
Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FIH, LLC
Represented By
Michael Anthony Savino
Cozen O'Connor - Ny
contact info
James I. Glasser
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Brian P. Flaherty
Cozen & O'Connor-PA
contact info
Kevin M. Smith
Wiggin & Dana
contact info
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen & O'Connor-Ny
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/16. (Harris, J)
GPO Apr 26 2016
ORDER granting 65 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 66 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/26/16. (Harris, J)
GPO May 18 2016
ENDORSEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/18/16.(Harris, J)
GPO Jul 28 2016
RULING denying in large part (Dkt. #118) Defendants' Motion to Continue to the extent that it seeks to cancel the August 4-5, 2016 PJR Hearing, and granting Defendants' Motion to Continue in limited part to the extent that continued hearing dates may be scheduled in late October; and denying in part (Dkt. #121) Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order to the extent that it seeks to postpone the August 1-2, 2016 depositions, but granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motione the requested limitations in appropriate motions to be filed with the Court during the remaining discovery period. (See Attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/28/2016. (Watson, M.) for Protective Order to the extent that the subject matter of the depositions is limited to any issues that will be raised at the PJR hearing; counsel will not be hampered by any of the conditions demanded by any of the parties, and counsel may rais
GPO Jan 31 2018
f's state-law claims are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/31/2018. (Kolker, J.)ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Plaintiff's Motion 174 for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and Defendants' Motions 173 176 178 179 for Summary Judgment are GRANTED as to Plaintiff's federal claim. Plaintif
GPO Oct 22 2019
ORDER addressing Parties' memoranda of law 223 224 and adhering to prior dismissal 210 of Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/22/19. (Gutierrez, A.)

1. For Foundation Capital, Deals Proved Elusive (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 02/18/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 06, 2021
318 318 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 12/08 1:27 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 12/6/2021 Affirming the306 judgment of the district court re:307 Notice of Appeal filed by FIH, LLC (Gutierrez, Y.)
Related: [-]