Tops PT, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:18-bk-22279
Lead case is: 7:18-bk-22279
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:18-bk-22282 |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tops PT, LLC
6363 Main St
Williamsville, NY 14221-5855 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order, Final Decree
Thu 03/21 4:56 PM
Order of Final Decree signed on 3/21/2019 (I) Closing Subsidiary Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 03/21 4:58 PM
Order of Final Decree signed on 3/21/2019 (I) Closing Subsidiary Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 01/02 9:44 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on 6/25/2018 for $0.00 filed by NYS Dept. of Labor. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Tue 05/08 3:56 PM
Pending Deadlines for Schedule A-H Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Schedules
Mon 05/07 9:49 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 05/07 9:23 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Schedules
Mon 05/07 9:23 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Update Deficiency Deadlines
Mon 04/23 10:27 AM
Deficiency Deadlines Updated: Order signed on 4/20/2018 Granting Application Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs through and including May 7, 2018, without prejudice to the Debtors right to seek further extensions upon a showing of cause therefor. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Matrix
Tue 02/27 4:35 PM
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Consolidated Creditor Matrix Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 02/26 1:15 PM
Order signed on 2/23/2018 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
6 | 6
order
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Mon 02/26 12:34 PM
Order signed on 2/26/2018 Granting Application Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs. Time by which Debtors shall file their Schedules is extended by an additional forty-five (45) days, through and including April 23, 2018 . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 02/26 1:20 PM
Case Joint Administration: 18-22279 rdd Tops Holding II Corporation (Lead Case), 18-22277 rdd Tops Markets, LLC; 18-22278 rdd Tops MBO Corporation; 18-22280 rdd Tops Holding LLC; 18-22281 rdd Tops Markets II Corporation; 18-22283 rdd Tops Gift Card Company, LLC; 18-22284 rdd Erie Logistics LLC and 18-22285 rdd TM1, LLC. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Wed 02/21 10:02 AM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 02/21 9:50 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Wed 02/21 9:28 AM
Declaration of Michael Buenzow Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Southern District of New York filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/21 9:20 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 02/21 8:24 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 03/7/2018. Schedule C due 03/7/2018. Schedule D due 03/7/2018. Schedule E/F due 03/7/2018. Schedule G due 03/7/2018. Schedule H due 03/7/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 03/7/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/7/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 03/7/2018, Filed by Ray C Schrock of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Tops PT, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 02/21 9:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-22282 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12442515. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 02/21 5:13 PM
Pending Deadline for Schedule C Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) |