Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00069
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2018
Terminated:Sep 09, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harold Lewis, DO
1901 W. William Cannon Suite 123
Austin, TX 78745
Represented By
Harold Lewis, DO
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Monday, September 09, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Mon 09/09 2:49 PM
Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement between Trustee and Multiple Defendants, as Amended Signed on 9/9/2019. (klt)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/09 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-69 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/25 10:07 AM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers and for Related Relief Filed by Harold Lewis, DO. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 05, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
7 7 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:22 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (mwb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
5 5 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 11:43 AM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
4 4 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:09 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/22 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Harold Lewis, DO 2/22/2018 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 02/22 8:17 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 02/22 3:46 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00069 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Paid. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (thc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 3:30 PM
Adversary case 18-00069 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Atherotech Holdings, Inc. against DR. HAROLD LEWIS, DO. Fee Amount $350 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3