Joint Admin
|
2:16-bk-00910 - Atherotech Holdings, Inc.
|
03/04/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00087 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Diadone
|
08/24/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00088 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Restorative Health of Alabama, LLC
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00089 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Comprehensive Medical Weight Loss, LLC
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00090 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Naku
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00091 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Envigor8 Utah, LLC
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00092 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Vertical Turbine Specialists, Inc.
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00093 - Reynolds, Trustee v. OneCare Clinic, LLC
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00094 - Reynolds, Trustee v. AMS Medical Laboratories, Inc.
|
08/25/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:16-ap-00107 - Reynolds v. Alliance Payroll Services, Inc. et al
|
09/26/2016
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00007 - Garner et al v. Atherotech Holdings, Inc.
|
01/12/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00031 - REYNOLDS v. Grifols, USA, LLC
|
02/27/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00087 - Reynolds v. Riverside Family Medicine, P.C.
|
08/18/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00100 - Reynolds v. Behrman et al
|
09/15/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00132 - Reynolds et al v. Premier Family Health PA dba Premier Family Health
|
11/22/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00133 - Reynolds et al v. West Jefferson Internal Medicine, PC
|
11/22/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00134 - Reynolds et al v. Warner Family Practice, PC
|
11/22/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00142 - Reynolds et al v. MClean
|
12/19/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00143 - Reynolds et al v. Curewell Medical Center, PC
|
12/19/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00144 - Reynolds et al v. Harding
|
12/19/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00145 - Reynolds et al v. Howard
|
12/19/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-00146 - Reynolds et al v. North River Primary Care Associates
|
12/19/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00009 - Reynolds v. Parkside Family Clinic, P.A.
|
01/19/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00010 - THOMAS E. REYNOLDS, TRUSTEE v. Roberto Bermudez, MD, PA
|
01/19/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00011 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Beltway Internal Medicine, LLC
|
01/19/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00013 - Reynolds et al v. Chaney, MD
|
01/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00014 - Reynolds, Trustee et al v. Kolb
|
01/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00018 - Reynolds v. McElroy
|
01/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00019 - Reynolds v. Ford
|
01/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00020 - Reynolds v. The Bale Center for the Prevention of Heart Attack
|
01/24/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00021 - Reynolds v. Alabama Family Medical Center, LLC
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00022 - Reynolds v. Avalon Medical Center, PC
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00023 - Reynolds v. Canyons Medical Center, PC
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00024 - Reynolds v. Chestertown Family Medicine PA of Galena
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00025 - Reynolds v. Hargadon
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00026 - Reynolds v. Henry County Medical Center, PC
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00027 - Reynolds v. Novant Health, Inc., a/k/a Pineville Primary Care
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00028 - Reynolds v. Temple Medical Clinic, PC
|
01/25/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00030 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Wynne
|
01/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00031 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Molai
|
01/29/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00032 - Reynolds, Trustee et al v. Dominguez, MD
|
01/30/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00033 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Guerrero, RNNP
|
01/31/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00034 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Cardiospecialists Group, Ltd.
|
01/31/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00035 - Reynolds, Trustee v. California Cardiovascular Care Medical Group, Inc.
|
01/31/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00036 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Lavaca Wellness Clinic, P.A.
|
02/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00037 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Richard F. Fowler, MD, PC dba Arizona Center for I
|
02/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00038 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Funk, DO
|
02/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00039 - Reynolds, Trustee v. CFP Physicians Group
|
02/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00040 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Mizrahi, MD
|
02/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00041 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Sharma, MD
|
02/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00042 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Jordan, MD
|
02/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00043 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Unlimited Medical Services of Florida, LLC
|
02/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00045 - Reynolds, Trustee v. San Diego Center for Integrative Medicine, Inc.
|
02/09/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00046 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Dr. Randolph's Ageless & Wellness Medical Cen
|
02/09/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00047 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Bridget R. Briggs, MD, Inc.
|
02/09/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00048 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Miami Center for Advanced Cardiology, LLC
|
02/09/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00049 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Family Healthcare of Wytheville, PC
|
02/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00050 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Cardiology Center of Houston, PA
|
02/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00051 - Reynolds v. Collins
|
02/12/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00053 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Tonnemacher, MD
|
02/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00054 - Reynolds, Trustee and Leslie S. Gaskill, MD, L.L.C.
|
02/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00055 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Medicine and Rheumatology Associates, P.A.
|
02/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00056 - Reynolds v. LHM CLINIC, PC
|
02/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00057 - Reynolds v. Lake Lansing Family Practice, PLLC
|
02/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00059 - Reynolds, Trustee v. North Fresno Family Health, Inc.
|
02/14/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00060 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Atlanta Metro Cardiology, LLC
|
02/14/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00061 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Fox, MD
|
02/14/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00062 - Reynolds v. George, MD
|
02/16/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00063 - Reynolds v. Personalcare Physicians of Newport Beach, Inc.
|
02/16/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00064 - Reynolds v. OB-GYN South, PC
|
02/16/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00065 - Reynolds v. Mainstreet Medical, PC
|
02/16/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00067 - Reynolds v. South Auburn Medical Clinic, Inc.
|
02/21/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00068 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Partners in Freedom, LLC
|
02/21/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00069 - Reynolds v. Lewis, DO
|
02/21/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00070 - Reynolds v. Panhandle Family Care Associates, Inc.
|
02/21/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00071 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Summers, MD
|
02/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00072 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Northwest Family Medical Center, PA
|
02/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00073 - Reynolds, Trustee v. North State Medical Group, PA
|
02/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00074 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Nolan, MD
|
02/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00075 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Day, II
|
02/22/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00076 - Reynolds, Trustee v. EMHFL, Inc. d/b/a Ephraim McDowell-Fort Logan Hosp
|
02/23/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00077 - Reynolds v. Arora, MD
|
02/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00078 - Reynolds v. Lewis Family Medicine, PLLC
|
02/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00079 - Reynolds v. Santos, MD
|
02/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00080 - Reynolds v. Wythe Medical Associates, Inc.
|
02/27/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00082 - Reynolds et al v. The Oxford Clinic, LLC
|
03/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00083 - Reynolds et al v. Dyer Medical Center, Inc.
|
03/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00084 - Reynolds, Trustee et al v. Frank H. Rudeseal, MD
|
03/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00085 - Reynolds et al v. Lahens Medical Center, Inc.
|
03/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00087 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Alternacare, P.C. dba Complete Family Care
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00088 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Memorial Hermann Hospital System
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00089 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Daphne Family Practice
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00090 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Griffith, MD
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00091 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Linda S. Falconio, MD, Inc. dba The Doctors Office
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00092 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Johnstone, MD
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00093 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Southview Medical Group, PC
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00094 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Hussey, DO
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00095 - Reynolds, Trustee v. John R. Harper III, MD, PC
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00096 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Northwest Arkansas Internal Medicine, PLLC
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00097 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Alabama Women's Specialists, P.C.
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00098 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Cox, DO
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00099 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Acipco Medical Group, Inc.
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00100 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Dy
|
03/02/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00101 - Reynolds v. Lawrence J. Schlitt dba or fdba Del Mar Family Pra
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00102 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Francis M. Kundi, MD, PC
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00103 - Reynolds v. Marc R. Shapiro, MD
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00104 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Family & Urgent Care Clinic, PLLC
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00105 - Reynolds v. Forest Family Care, Inc.
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00106 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00107 - Reynolds v. James M. Hoff, MD
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00108 - Reynolds v. Mark Hoff, MD
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00109 - Reynolds v. Birmingham Obstetrics/Gynecology, PC
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00110 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Primary Care Northwest, PLLC
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00111 - Reynolds v. Wyndhurst Family Medicine, PC
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00112 - Reynolds v. Beebe Medical Center, Inc.
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00113 - Reynolds v. Joy Emmanuel Cochrane, DO, Inc., dba Lakes Urgent
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00114 - Reynolds v. Donny Huang, MD
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00115 - Reynolds v. Dr. Charles Kilo
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00116 - Reynolds v. Medical Offices of Scott Halperin, MD, PA
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00117 - Reynolds v. Karen Kutikoff, MD, PA
|
03/04/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00118 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Springhill Hospitals, Inc.
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00119 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Debin, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00120 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Dimick, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00121 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Reed, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00122 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Acharya
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00123 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Mathew, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00124 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Up 2 Par Medical Clinic, LLC
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00125 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Coastal Internal Medicine Specialists, PA
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00126 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I.
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00127 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Sage Health, LLC
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00128 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Rathbone (A Medical Corporation) dba Rathbone Clin
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00129 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Freeman Family Practice, LLC
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00130 - Reynolds v. Family Medical Center of Georgetown, P.A.
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00131 - Reynolds v. SAMUEL E. WARD, MD DBA FAMILY HEALTH CARE OF CHIPL
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00132 - Reynolds v. REVANA FAMILY PARTNERS, LP
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00133 - Reynolds v. IVAN CVIK, MD, PA
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00134 - Reynolds, Trustee v. ILIANA MICALI, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00135 - Reynolds v. LOUIS P. COATES, DO
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00136 - Reynolds v. ADRIENNE ERTL, MD
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00137 - Reynolds v. ABOUT WOMEN'S HEALTH MEDICAL GROUP, A PROFESS
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00138 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Cosma, M.D. et al
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00139 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Sammarone, Jr., DO
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00140 - Reynolds, Trustee v. University Family Medicine Center, PA
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00141 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Plant City Internal Medicine Specialists, PA
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00142 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Medical Group of North County, Inc.
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00143 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Diel dba Affordable Medical Care
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00144 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00145 - Reynolds, Trustee v. Almirol, MD dba Almirol Internal Medicine et al
|
03/05/2018
|
Adversary
|
2:18-ap-00174 - Garner et al v. Behrman Brothers IV L.L.C. et al
|
05/31/2018
|