Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00094
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2018
Terminated:Aug 24, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jim P. Hussey, DO
399 W Campbell Rd Ste 204
Richardson, TX 75080
Represented By
Jim P. Hussey, DO
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Jeffrey Ryan Barber
Jones Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Saturday, January 05, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
10 10 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:13 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (thc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 26, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/26 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Friday, August 24, 2018
8 8 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/24 3:19 PM
Clerk's Notice of Dismissal and Closing of Adversary Proceeding (klt) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018 (klt)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/24 2:26 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Against Dr. Jim P. Hussey, DO Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee (Brazeal, Clyde) Modified on 8/24/2018 to match text to pdf (klt)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/24 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-94 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
5 5 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 12:53 PM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
4 4 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:15 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/13 2:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jim P. Hussey, DO 3/5/2018 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/06 12:01 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00094 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Paid. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (thc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, March 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 03/05 9:01 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
misc Payment of Fee (Adversary Proceeding) Mon 03/05 1:18 PM
Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee. Fee Amount $350, Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Related [+] Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Jim P. Hussey, DO. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee).
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-00094 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)ynoldsoffice, dm
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 03/05 1:23 PM
Receipt of Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee 18-00094 TOM) [misc,payadv] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21795246. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Friday, March 02, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/02 5:24 PM
Adversary case 18-00094 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Jim P. Hussey, DO. Fee Amount $350 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer