Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00106
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2018
Terminated:Jul 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.
13670 Metropolis Ave. Suite 104
Fort Myers, FL 33908
Represented By
Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/14 11:46 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-106 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
13 13 order Approving Tue 07/14 11:45 AM
Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Signed on 4/17/2020. (klt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/25 3:36 PM
Answer to Complaint (Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.'s Answer to Trustee's Adversary Complaint) Filed by Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.. (Humphries, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 05, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
10 10 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:21 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (thc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 09/15 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
8 8 4 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Wed 09/12 10:28 AM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed in the "P&H Adversary Proceedings". Movants shall file answers to Counts I through IV of the Complaints within fourteen (14) days of the Courts entry of this Order. Signed on 9/12/2018. (klt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
6 6 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 1:03 PM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
5 5 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:15 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/16 5:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Defendant Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A.. (Porterfield, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/08 9:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on Robert B. Pritt, DO, P.A. 3/8/2018 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 03/07 2:21 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00106 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Paid. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (thc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Payment of Fee (Adversary Proceeding) Wed 03/07 1:54 PM
Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee. Fee Amount $350, Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Related [+] Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee, Atherotech Holdings, Inc. against ROBERT B. PRITT, DO, PA. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee).
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-00106 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)ynoldsoffice, dm
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 03/07 1:58 PM
Receipt of Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee 18-00106 TOM) [misc,payadv] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21807276. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Monday, March 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 03/05 11:05 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Sunday, March 04, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 03/04 6:26 PM
Adversary case 18-00106 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee, Atherotech Holdings, Inc. against ROBERT B. PRITT, DO, PA. Fee Amount $350 (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer