Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00126
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2018
Terminated:Nov 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Andrea J. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I.
66 South 21st St
Kenilworth, NJ 07033
Represented By
Andrea J. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Jeffrey Ryan Barber
Jones Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Monday, November 01, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/01 1:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-126 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 09/29 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Default Judgment
Monday, September 27, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Default Judgment Mon 09/27 10:27 AM
Default Judgment Signed on 9/27/2021 Related [+]. (klt)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Saturday, September 11, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 09/11 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, September 09, 2021
13 13 order Default Judgment Thu 09/09 3:11 PM
Notice and Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 9/9/2021. (klt)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/09 12:19 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Default Judgment Motion due by 10/12/2021. (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 21, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/21 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, August 19, 2021
10 10 court Clerk Entry of Default Thu 08/19 9:52 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (klt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee,9 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
9 9 motion Entry of Default Wed 08/18 5:01 PM
Application for Entry of Default Related [+] Plaintiff's Application to Clerk of Entry of Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee (Brazeal, Clyde)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Saturday, January 05, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
7 7 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:13 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (klt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
5 5 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 1:20 PM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
4 4 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:18 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
3 3 2 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/13 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Andrea J. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I. 3/7/2018 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/06 2:56 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00126 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Paid. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (thc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Payment of Fee (Adversary Proceeding) Tue 03/06 1:36 PM
Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee. Fee Amount $350, Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Related [+] Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Andrea J. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I.. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee).
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-00126 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)ynoldsoffice, dm
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/06 1:47 PM
Receipt of Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee 18-00126 TOM) [misc,payadv] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21801279. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Monday, March 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 03/05 3:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/05 12:19 PM
Adversary case 18-00126 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Andrea J. Frank, D.O., F.A.C.O.I.. Fee Amount $350 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer