Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-50557

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ronald B King
Case #: 5:18-ap-05051
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2018
Terminated:Jun 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC
Represented By
Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust
Represented By
Kara E Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, June 28, 2018
9 9 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 06/28 11:40 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Kara E Casteel for Plaintiff Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/28 3:10 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Tue 06/19 6:12 AM
Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC answer deadline updated to 7/9/2018 (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
8 8 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 06/18 7:34 AM
Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant To Respond To The Complaint filed by Brigette G McGrath for Plaintiff Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
7 7 order AP-Seek Default (F) Thu 05/17 6:40 AM
Order for Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust to Seek Default against Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC . Default Judgment Motion due by 6/18/2018 (Order entered on 5/17/2018) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Mon 04/30 10:19 AM
Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC answer deadline updated to 5/14/2018 (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
6 6 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 04/27 2:36 PM
Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant To Respond To The Complaint filed by Brigette G McGrath for Plaintiff Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
5 5 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 04/12 1:18 PM
Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant To Respond To The Complaint filed by Brigette G McGrath for Plaintiff Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Thu 04/12 2:30 PM
Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC answer deadline updated to 4/30/2018 (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 04/11 3:15 PM
Order for Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust to Seek Default against Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/11/2018 (Order entered on 4/11/2018) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/13 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Kara E Casteel for Plaintiff Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust. (Casteel, Kara) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05051 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 filed by Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (attorney Kara E Casteel) against Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Casteel, Kara) Modified on 3/6/2018.,2 Summons Issued on Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC Answer Due 04/4/2018
Monday, March 05, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 03/05 12:56 PM
Summons Issued on Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC Answer Due 04/4/2018 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/05 12:56 PM
Adversary case 18-05051 Complaint filed by Buffets Unsecured Creditors' Trust (attorney Kara E Casteel) against Liquid Environmental Solutions of Texas, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Mon 03/05 1:39 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 18-05051 rbk) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 19168358 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1