Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00909

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-ap-00144
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2018
Terminated:Feb 13, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC
12953 Palms West Dr Ste 202
Loxahatchee, FL 33470
Represented By
Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 503
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Jeffrey Ryan Barber
Jones Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, February 15, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/16 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
10 10 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/13 8:04 AM
Clerk's Notice of Dismissal and Closing of Adversary Proceeding (klt)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/13 8:05 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-144 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
9 9 notice Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/12 3:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee. (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 05, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 03, 2019
7 7 8 pgs order Order (Generic-from hearing) Thu 01/03 4:30 PM
Order Requiring All Defendants in P&H Adversary Proceedings to Answer or Face Potential Default Signed on 1/3/2019. (klt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/27 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Thursday, May 24, 2018
5 5 court Notice (Blank) Thu 05/24 1:36 PM
Notice of Opportunity to File Appearance in Main Case and Notice of Hearing in P&H Adversary Proceedings. (rwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
4 4 misc Courtroom Notes Thu 04/26 8:19 AM
Courtroom Notes NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND PROCEDURES FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES . (klt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/13 4:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC 3/7/2018 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 03/06 2:49 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/06 2:56 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00144 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Paid. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (thc)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Payment of Fee (Adversary Proceeding) Tue 03/06 1:46 PM
Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee. Fee Amount $350, Filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Related [+] Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee).
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-00144 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)ynoldsoffice, dm
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/06 1:48 PM
Receipt of Payment of Adversary Proceeding Fee 18-00144 TOM) [misc,payadv] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21801279. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Monday, March 05, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/05 6:38 PM
Adversary case 18-00144 13 Related [+]) Complaint by Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee against Wellington Medical Care Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer