Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:12-cv-04865
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2012
Terminated:Aug 23, 2013
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2016 12:39 AM EST
Appellant
Exchange Bondholder Group
Represented By
Michael E. Petrella
O'Shea Partners LLP
contact info
Sean F. O'Shea
O'Shea Partners LLP
contact info
Amanda Lynn Devereux
O'Shea Partners LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Hibshoosh
O'Shea Partners LLP
contact info
Appellant
Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By
Eric Andrew Schaffer
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Appellant
Fintech Advisory Inc.
Represented By
William Francis Dahill
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2013
OPINION, dismissing appeal 12-4865, by RSP, BDP, RR, FILED.[1024470] [12-4865]

Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 11:06 PM EST
Wednesday, December 12, 2012
6 6 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Fintech Advisory Inc., FILED. [796240] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:46 AM]
Related: [-]
7 7 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 11/21/2012, RECEIVED.[796246] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:49 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 11/21/2012, RECEIVED.[796247] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:49 AM]
Related: [-]
9 9 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/21/2012, RECEIVED.[796248] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:50 AM]
Related: [-]
10 10 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/26/2012, RECEIVED.[796251] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:51 AM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[796254] 12-4865 [Entered: 12/18/2012 08:52 AM]
Related: [-]