New Jersey District Court
Judge:Anne E Thompson
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:18-cv-03540
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2018
Terminated:Mar 13, 2019
Last checked: Monday Sep 10, 2018 5:11 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
AHEAD ENGINEERING LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
FAR FIELD TELECOM LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
DANIEL HERNANDEZ
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
KYLE MCGINLEY
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
CHAD SCHWARTZ
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
RYAN WALDRON
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
SCHERER DESIGN GROUP, LLC
Represented By
RONALD D. COLEMAN
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info
BRIAN MATTHEW BLOCK
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL HERNANDEZ
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
KYLE MCGINLEY
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHAD SCHWARTZ
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
RYAN WALDRON
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
AHEAD ENGINEERING LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
FAR FIELD TELECOM LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
DAVID C. KISTLER
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCHERER DESIGN GROUP, LLC
Represented By
RONALD D. COLEMAN
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info
BRIAN MATTHEW BLOCK
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2018
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/19/2018. (mmh)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
80 80 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 05/01 2:18 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DAVID C. KISTLER terminated. (KISTLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
79 79 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/24 1:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/24/2019. (jem)
Related: [-]
78 78 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/24 10:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SCHERER DESIGN GROUP, LLC. (BLOCK, BRIAN)
Related: [-]