Original Case: 3:18-cv-03540

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-02835
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2018
Terminated:Feb 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 26, 2019 3:27 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
AHEAD ENGINEERING
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FAR FIELD TELECOM LLC
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
DANIEL HERNANDEZ
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
RYAN WALDRON
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CHAD SCHWARTZ
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KYLE MCGINLEY
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KYLE MCGINLEY
Represented By
Michael A. Iannucci
Blank Rome
contact info
David Kistler
Blank Rome
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SCHERER DESIGN GROUP
Represented By
Brian Block
Mandelbaum Salsburg
contact info
Ronald D. Coleman
Mandelbaum Salsburg
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2019
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, SHWARTZ and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 26. Judge: SHWARTZ Authoring, Judge: AMBRO Dissenting. We will affirm.

Docket last updated: 02/26/2019 3:27 AM EST
Monday, August 20, 2018
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Ahead Engineering LLC, Far Field Telecom LLC, Daniel Hernandez, Chad Schwartz and Ryan Waldron in District Court No. 3-18-cv-03540. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs STANDING ORDER
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 5 2 pgs PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER
Att: 6 18 pgs OPINION