Does 1-7 v. Abbott et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00629 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | USCA5, 18-11620 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Greg Abbott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven McCraw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Does 1-7
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Tue 01/07 11:45 AM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to43 Notice of Appeal filed by John Does 1-7. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court isaffirmed. Issued as Mandate: 1/7/2020. (svc) |
|
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Opinion
Tue 01/07 11:42 AM
Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re43 Notice of Appeal filed by John Does 1-7. (svc) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Thu 05/30 3:29 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11620 : Record consisting of: 2 Volume(s) ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA), transmitted to USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express (svc) |
||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/05 8:53 AM
USCA Case Number 18-11620 in USCA5 for43 Notice of Appeal filed by John Does 1-7. (svc) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Tue 02/05 8:55 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11620 : Record consisting of: 2 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (svc) |
||
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
2
pgs
appeal
Transcript Order Form DKT-13 - Transcript Requested/Not Requested
Fri 12/28 3:47 PM
Certificate of No Transcript/Transcript Order Form: re43 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court.. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (axm). |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
misc
Amended Document
Tue 12/18 11:26 AM
AMENDED Notice of Appeal by John Does 1-7 Re:43 Notice of Appeal as to41 Order on Motion to Dismiss,42 Judgment. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
43 | 43
2
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 12/18 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to41 Order on Motion to Dismiss,42 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit by John Does 1-7. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-9653042. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Mon 11/19 4:43 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiffs take nothing from their claims. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/19/2018) (epm) |
|
41 | 41
29
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/19 2:57 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss. The Court DISMISSES with prejudice all of Plaintiffs' claims against Governor Abbott. The Court also GRANTS Defendants' Motion under Rule 12(b)(6). Because the Court finds that allowing Plaintiffs the opportunity to replead would be futile, the Court DISMISSES with prejudice all Plaintiffs' claims. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/19/2018) (epm) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 11/06 5:28 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Stay. All discovery and all remaining scheduling order deadlines identified in the Court's Schedule Order (Doc.26 ) are hereby STAYED pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/6/2018) (axm) |
|
39 | 39
5
pgs
motion
Stay
Tue 11/06 1:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 10/22 10:14 AM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Protective Order (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/22/2018) (svc) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
motion
Protective Order
Fri 10/19 4:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order filed by John Does 1-7 (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
11
pgs
respm
Reply
Fri 10/05 11:55 AM
REPLY filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw re:17 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 09/20 3:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by John Does 1-7 re: 31 Order, (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/18 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting33 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Reply. Defendants' Reply is now due on or before October 5, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/18/2018) (chmb) |
|
33 | 33
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/18 8:49 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to29 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,27 Response/Objection filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/13 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting28 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Page Limit to the Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. In light of the issues raised in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the Court allows Plaintiffs' response to be 26 pages. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/13/2018) (chmb) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order
Thu 09/13 10:14 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to Show Cause why they did not file their Second Amended Complaint on or before September 12, 2018, as requested in Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 22), and granted by the Court (Doc. 23). Plaintiffs must respond to this Order to Show Cause on or before September 20, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/13/2018) (chmb) |
|
30 | 30
2
pgs
notice
Certificate of Conference
Thu 09/13 8:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Conference re28 MOTION to extend page limit by Terence Estes-Hightower on behalf of John Does 1-7 (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
32
pgs
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 09/12 11:38 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by John Does 1-7 re27 Response/Objection,18 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Response to Motion to Dismiss (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
28 | 28
3
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/12 11:09 PM
MOTION to extend page limit filed by John Does 1-7 (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
27 | 27
5
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 09/12 11:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by John Does 1-7 re:17 MOTION to Dismiss (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
9
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/11 4:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 10/14/2019 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 1/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2019. Motions due by 7/16/2019. Discovery due by 6/17/2019. Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 9/30/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/11/2018) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
8
pgs
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/10 1:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw. (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 08/20 12:24 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/10/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/20/2018) (svc) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 08/17 1:45 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint is September 12, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/17/2018) (chmb) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/17 10:17 AM
MOTION to Extend Time Amended Complaint filed by John Does 1-7 (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/06 11:01 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is now due September 12, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/6/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/03 7:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Does 1-7 (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/31 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw. (Abrams, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
43
pgs
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 07/31 4:02 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw re17 MOTION to Dismiss (Abrams, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
4
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 07/31 4:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/27 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Motion (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/27/2018) (chmb) |
|
15 | 15
4
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/27 9:07 AM
MOTION Exceed Page Limits filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned
Thu 06/21 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Steven McCraw; served on 6/12/2018. (zkc) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Tue 06/19 3:55 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: denying without prejudice10 motion to certify class. Because Defendants have not yet filed an answer or responsive pleading, the Court finds Plaintiffs' motion to certify premature and DENIES the motion without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/19/2018) (chmb) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 06/19 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer or responsive pleading is now due July 31, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/19/2018) (chmb) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 06/19 9:22 AM
MOTION to Extend Time File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Greg Abbott, Steven McCrawAttorney Michael Abrams added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Abrams added to party Steven McCraw(pty:dft) (Abrams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline (Public Entry)
Tue 06/19 11:30 AM
Answer due from Greg Abbott on 7/31/2018; Steven McCraw on 7/31/2018 per #12. (svc) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Certify Class
Tue 06/12 4:04 PM
MOTION to Certify Class filed by John Does 1-7 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Unfiling Pleading
Mon 06/11 1:22 PM
Order Unfiling5 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by John Does 1-7 due to the following deficiency: The motion must include certificate of conference or inability to confer. See LR 7.1(b). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/11/2018) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/07 11:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw. (ykp) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Thu 06/07 9:00 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by John Does 1-7. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Thu 06/07 8:57 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by John Does 1-7. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Certify Class
Wed 06/06 4:38 PM
First MOTION to Certify Class filed by John Does 1-7 with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party John Does 8-152 added. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
4 | 4
182
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/06 4:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants filed by John Does 1-7. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Wed 03/28 4:21 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:18-CV-0629-B. (zkc) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Fish
Fri 03/16 2:57 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/16 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Greg Abbott, Steven McCraw filed by John Does #1-7. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9056776) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Estes-Hightower, Terence) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) | ||
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/16 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Does 1-7. See document1 for image. (ykp) |