Kane v. Island Leasing LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-90007 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Island Leasing LLC
733 Bishop Street, Suite 2000
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
473 | 473
misc
miscellaneous document
Tue 09/26 8:55 AM
Return of Non-Cash Collateral . (LC) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 09/26 9:10 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:18-ap-90007). (LL) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
472 | 472
order
Text Order (Special)
Fri 09/22 5:45 PM
[The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.] Order Authorizing Return of Irrevocable Letter of Credit. Pursuant to the Satisfaction of Judgment and Authorization for the Clerk to Return Irrevocable Letter of Credit, filed 9/22/2023 by the Plaintiff, the clerk shall return promptly the Irrevocable Letter of Credit to counsel for Island Leasing, LLC. |
|
471 | 471
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Fri 09/22 4:34 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment dated March 10, 2020 and Authorization for the Clerk to Return Irrevocable Letter of Credit . Filed by Alika L. Piper on behalf of Elizabeth A Kane. (Piper, Alika) |