FGI Operating Company, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10684
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10684
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10686 |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
FGI Operating Company, LLC
870 Remington Dr
Madison, NC 27025-8331 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/14 11:00 AM
Order Approving Stipulation of Reorganized Debtors and Litigation Trustee to Extend Deadline for Litigation Trustee to File Notice of Intent to Bring Specific Avoidance Action. Signed on 1/14/2019 (SJS) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/12 1:05 PM
Order Partially Vacating Final Decree [Dkt. No. 335] to Extent it Closed Certain Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 9/11/2018 (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 07/18 10:07 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Final Decree
Mon 07/16 2:47 PM
Final Decree (I) Closing Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Terminating Certain Claims And Noticing Services; And (III) Granting Related Relief. Order Signed on 7/16/2018 (BJM) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/27 6:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10686 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8808142, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 03/27 4:10 PM
Order Approving Joint Administration of Debtor's Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the FRBP directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Remington Outdoor Company Inc. 18-10684 FGI Holding Company, LLC 18-10685 FGI Operating Company, LLC 18-10686 Remington Arms Company, LLC 18-10687 Barnes Bullets, LLC 18-10688 TMRI, Inc. 18-10689 RA Brands, LLC 18-10690 FGI Finance, Inc. 18-10691 Remington Arms Distribution Company, LLC 18-10692 Huntsville Holdings LLC 18-10693 32E Productions, LLC 18-10694 Great Outdoors Holdco, LLC 18-10695 and Outdoor Services, LLC 18-10696 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, In re: Remington Outdoor Company Inc. 18-10684 Signed on 3/27/2018 (LCo) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 03/26 8:06 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LCo) |
||
Sunday, March 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 03/25 9:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by FGI Operating Company, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix |