California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 3:18-cv-01865
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2018
Terminated:Mar 13, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 22, 2018 1:54 AM PDT
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By
Vladimir Frank Kozina
Mayall Hurley, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
Nanette Diaz Barragan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michael F. Bennet
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Howard Berman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Donald S. Beyer, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Earl Blumenauer
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Richard Blumenthal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Cory A. Booker
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Anthony G. Brown
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michael Capuano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Salud O. Carbajal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tony Cardenas
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ben Cardin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Andre Carson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Judy Chu
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David N. Cicilline
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Yvette D. Clarke
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Wm. Lacy Clay
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Emanuel Cleaver, II
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
James Clyburn
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Steve Cohen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gerrold Connolly
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
J. Luis Correa
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Joe Courtney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Joe Crowley
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry Cuellar
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Elijah E. Cummings
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Danny K. Davis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Diana DeGette
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Rosa L. DeLauro
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark DeSaulnier
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John K. Delaney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ted Deutch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Debbie Dingell
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tammy Duckworth
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Richard Durbin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Keith Ellison
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Eliot L. Engel
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Adriano Espaillat
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Elizabeth Esty
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bill Foster
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Lois Frankel
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Marcia L. Fudge
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ruben Gallego
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jimmy Gomez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gene Green
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Raul M. Grijalva
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Luis V. Gutierrez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Colleen Hanabusa
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Kamala D. Harris
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Alcee L. Hastings
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mazie Hirono
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Steny Hoyer
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Sheila Jackson Lee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Pramila Jayapal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Hakeem Jeffries
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry C. "Hank" Johnson, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ro Khanna
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ruben J. Kihuen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Daniel T. Kildee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John B. Larson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brenda L. Lawrence
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Barbara Lee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Lewis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Zoe Lofgren
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Alan Lowenthal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nita Lowey
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michelle Lujan Grisham
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Stephen F. Lynch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Carolyn Maloney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Doris Matsui
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Betty McCollum
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
A. Donald McEachin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
James P. McGovern
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jerry McNerney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gregory W. Meeks
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Grace Meng
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gwen Moore
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Constance Morella
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Muslim Advocates
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
NALEO Educational Fund
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Jerrold Nadler
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Grace F. Napolitano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
National Coalition on Black Civic Participation
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Bill Nelson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Rick Nolan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Donald Norcross
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Eleanor Holmes Norton
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jimmy Panetta
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bill Pascrell, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nancy Pelosi
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ed Perlmutter
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Chellie Pingree
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark Pocan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jared Polis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Porter
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David E. Price
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Project on Fair Representation
Represented By
Bryan Kipp Weir
Consovoy Mccarthy Park PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Mike Quigley
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jamie Raskin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Kathleen M. Rice
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jacky Rosen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Lucille Roybal-Allard
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bobby L. Rush
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Linda T. Sanchez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Sarbanes
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Janice D. Schakowsky
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brian Schatz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Claudine Schneider
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jose Serrano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brad Sherman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Albio Sires
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David Skaggs
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Adam Smith
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Peter Smith
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Darren Soto
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jackie Speier
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark Takano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
The Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
The Leadership Conference Education Fund
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Bennie G. Thompson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mike Thompson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Dina Titus
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Norma J. Torres
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Juan Vargas
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Filemon Vela
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nydia M. Velazquez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tim Walz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Debbie Wasserman Schultz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bonnie Watson Coleman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry A. Waxman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Peter Welch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ron Wyden
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Yarmuth
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Defendant
Frank Pallone, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Defendant
Ron Jarmin
Represented By
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Wilbur Ross, Jr
Represented By
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Census Bureau
Represented By
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By
Keith Alexander Yeomans
Dannis Woliver Kelley
contact info
Sue Ann Salmon Evans
Dannis Woliver Kelley
contact info
David Robert Holmquist, Myles
David R Holmquist
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Fremont
Represented By
Harvey Levine
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Fremont
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Long Beach
Represented By
Michael John Mais
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Long Beach
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Valerie Louise Flores
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Los Angeles
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Oakland
Represented By
Malia McPherson
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Oakland
contact info
Erin Brianna Bernstein
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Oakland
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Stockton
Represented By
John Michael Luebberke
City Attorney'S Office For The City Of Stockton
contact info
Plaintiff
County of Los Angeles
Represented By
Margaret Louise Carter
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel R. Suvor
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Charles Lagrange Coleman, III
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
David Ilan Holtzman
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
State of California
Represented By
R. Matthew Wise
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Gabrielle Downey Boutin
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info

GPO Aug 30 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 78 TO CASE SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Bench Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/30/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
GPO Jan 18 2019
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Evidence Relating to Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses Drs. Habermann and Handley. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
Docket last updated: 08/23/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2019
243 243 42 pgs misc Bill of Costs Fri 5:22 PM
BILL OF COSTS (Amended) by Los Angeles Unified School District. Objections due by 8/30/2019. (Salmon Evans, Sue)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
242 242 42 pgs misc Bill of Costs Thu 3:30 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Los Angeles Unified School District. Objections due by 8/29/2019. (Salmon Evans, Sue)**Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 8/16/2019 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
241 241 92 pgs misc Bill of Costs Thu 10:01 AM
BILL OF COSTS by State of California. Objections due by 8/29/2019. (Boutin, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]