State of California, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al
Original Case: 3:18-cv-01865
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-15456 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2019 1:33 AM PDT |
Defendant - Appellant
WILBUR ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Commerce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
RON JARMIN, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the U.S. Census Bureau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
U.S. CENSUS BUREAU
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor-Plaintiff - Appellee
LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITY OF LOS ANGELES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITY OF FREMONT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITY OF LONG BEACH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITY OF OAKLAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITY OF STOCKTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/30/2019 1:32 AM PDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellants Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Census Bureau and United States Department of Commerce opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellees City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Stockton, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Unified School District and State of California answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11227322] (JBS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:01 AM] | |
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter | ||
Att: 3 22 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing | ||
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael James Mongan for Appellee State of California. Date of service: 03/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11228652] 19-15456 (Mongan, Michael) [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:04 PM] |