Cory Spencer, et al v. Brant Blakeman
Original Case: 2:16-cv-02129
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-55383 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 31, 2020 1:34 AM PDT |
Defendant - Appellant
BRANT BLAKEMAN, an individual member of the Lunada Bay Boys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CORY SPENCER, an individual
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DIANA MILENA REED, an individual
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
COASTAL PROTECTION RANGERS, INC., a California non-profit public benefit corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/31/2020 1:29 AM PDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/30/2018. First cross appeal brief due 06/27/2018 for Coastal Protection Rangers, Inc., Diana Milena Reed and Cory Spencer. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/27/2018 for Brant Blakeman, City of Palos Verdes Estates, Does, Angelo Ferrara, Charlie Ferrara, Frank Ferrara, Alan Johnston, Jeff Kepley, Sang Lee, Lunada Bay Boys and Michael Rae Papayans. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/27/2018 for Coastal Protection Rangers, Inc., Diana Milena Reed and Cory Spencer [10811239] 18-55383 18-55364 (RT) [Entered: 03/23/2018 04:40 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Mediation Letter | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire | ||
Att: 3 9 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Cross Appeal Chart | ||
Att: 5 4 pgs Docketing Letter |