California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:18-cv-01880
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2018
Re-opened:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Nov 14, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 23, 2018 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
Represented By
John Nadolenco
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Matthew David Provance
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Lauren R Goldman
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clayton P. Zellmer
Represented By
Albert Y. Chang
Bottini And Bottini, Inc.
contact info
David Philip Milian
Carey Rodriguez Milian Gonya LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2022
ORDER RE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/31/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
GPO Mar 31 2022
ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/31/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
GPO Nov 14 2022
ORDER RE STANDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2022. ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
108 108 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 07/09 11:49 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to105 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Clayton P. Zellmer (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]