Original Case: 3:18-cv-01880

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-16925
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2022
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 2:29 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae - Pending
SECURITY INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Roman Martinez
Latham & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By
John Nadolenco
Mayer Brown, LLP
contact info
Lauren R. Goldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Whitty Somvichian
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
META PLATFORMS, INC.
Represented By
Lefteri J. Christos
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
John Nadolenco
Mayer Brown, LLP
contact info
Lauren R. Goldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Michael Brandon
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Whitty Somvichian
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLAYTON P. ZELLMER, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
John Carey
Carey Rodriguez Milian, LLP
contact info
David Philip Milian
Carey Rodriguez Milian Gonya, LLP
contact info
Albert Y. Chang
Bottini & Bottini, Inc.
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2024
FILED OPINION (RYAN D. NELSON, DANIELLE J. FORREST and GABRIEL P. SANCHEZ) Meta is entitled to summary judgment on the Section 15(b) claim. And Zellmer lacks standing to bring his Section 15(a) claim. AFFIRMED. Judge: RDN Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12891917]

Docket last updated: 06/19/2024 2:28 AM PDT
Thursday, December 15, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Clayton P. Zellmer Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2022. Transcript ordered by 01/12/2023. Transcript due 02/13/2023. Appellant Clayton P. Zellmer opening brief due 03/23/2023. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 04/24/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12611707] (RT) [Entered: 12/15/2022 02:13 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet