Seidel v. Healthstream, Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-32255
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03046 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Healthstream, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
SEIDEL LAW FIRM 6505 West Park Blvd. Suite 306
Plano, TX 75093 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
court
Receipt of filing fee for complaint
Wed 03/30 8:55 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SW. Receipt Number 339228. (admin) |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Mon 01/07 12:01 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3046 closed (Taylor, A) |
||
Sunday, December 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Sun 12/23 11:32 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss case
Fri 12/21 11:29 AM
Order dismissing case with prejudice . Entered on 12/21/2018 (Blanco, J.) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding
Thu 12/20 12:43 PM
Agreed Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel.(Young, Aynsley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
court
Close adversary case
Thu 12/20 3:53 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3046 closed (Kerr, S.) |
||
Saturday, September 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Sat 09/08 11:30 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Continue
Thu 09/06 11:32 AM
Order granting motion to continue hearing on Trial Docket Call date set for 1/28/2019 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Trial to be held the week of 1/21/2019 Entered on 9/6/2018. (Whitaker, Sheniqua) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Tue 09/04 10:51 AM
Agreed Motion to continue hearing on filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel (Young, Aynsley) |
|
court
Hearing held
Thu 09/06 3:11 PM
Trial Docket Call held on 9/4/2018. (REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED FOR JANUARY 2019 TRIAL DOCKET CALL.) (Harden, D.) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons service executed
Wed 05/09 9:29 AM
Summons service executed on Healthstream, Inc 5/4/2018 (Young, Aynsley) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons issued
Fri 05/04 2:11 PM
Summons reissued on Healthstream, Inc Answer Due 6/4/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended complaint
Thu 05/03 11:22 AM
Amended complaint by Aynsley Kay Young on behalf of Scott M. Seidel against Healthstream, Inc No change to nature of suit. . (Young, Aynsley) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 03/30 3:20 PM
Summons service executed on Healthstream, Inc 3/30/2018 (Kaisani, Fareed) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Wed 03/28 4:23 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 9/4/2018 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Houser Ctrm. Entered on 3/28/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons issued
Wed 03/28 4:22 PM
Summons issued on Healthstream, Inc Answer Due 4/27/2018 (Harden, D.) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (generic)
Wed 03/28 11:56 AM
Notice to Defer Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Kaisani, Fareed) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/28 2:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-03046 bjh) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number TC - Trustee Seidel deferred Adversary Proceeding filing fee, amount $ 0.00 . (Castillo) |
||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/27 7:29 PM
Adversary case 18-03046 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against HEALTHSTREAM, INC.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . (Kaisani, Fareed) |