Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:18-cv-00756
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2018
Re-opened:Apr 21, 2021
Terminated:Sep 18, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 29, 2018 3:21 AM MDT
Defendant
Andrea Albo
Represented By
Edward James Gorman
Denver City And County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Denver City Attorney'S Office-West Colfax Avenue
contact info
Defendant
City and County of Denver
Represented By
Edward James Gorman
Denver City And County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Denver City Attorney'S Office-West Colfax Avenue
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Firman
Represented By
Edward James Gorman
Denver City And County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Denver City Attorney'S Office-West Colfax Avenue
contact info
Defendant
Michael Hancock
Represented By
Edward James Gorman
Denver City And County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Denver City Attorney'S Office-West Colfax Avenue
contact info
Defendant
Jess Vigil
Represented By
Edward James Gorman
Denver City And County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Denver City Attorney'S Office-West Colfax Avenue
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Calderon
Represented By
Patricia S. Bangert
Patricia S. Bangert, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 17 2019
ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 21 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prudential standing. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, defendants may have their costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court. This case is closed, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/17/19.(sgrim)
GPO Aug 21 2023
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/21/2023, re: 65 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that plaintiff's first claim for violations of her First Amendment rights is DISMISSED with prejudice against defendant Patrick Firman. ORDERED that plaintiff's second claim for violations of her Fourteenth Amendment rights is DISMISSED with prejudice. ORDERED that plaintiff's third claim for conspiracy under § 1983 is DISMISSED with prejudice against defendant Patrick Firman and DISMISSED with prejudice to the extent it is predicated on a conspiracy to violate plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment rights. (jtorr, )
GPO Mar 28 2025
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court RECOMMENDS denying the plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Complaint. ECF No. 135. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 3/28/2025. (dgumb, )
GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/14/2025, re: 155 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Complaint [Docket No. 135] is DENIED. (dgumb, )
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Saturday, April 19, 2025
167 167 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 04/19 10:59 AM
REPLY to Response to165 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lisa Calderon. (Bangert, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
166 166 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/17 3:24 PM
RESPONSE to165 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Regina Huerter, City and County of Denver, Michael Hancock, Jess Vigil, Andrea Albo. (Horn, Michele)
Related: [-]
165 165 motion Leave Thu 04/17 11:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Lisa Calderon.(Bangert, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document Surreply
Monday, April 14, 2025
164 164 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Supplement Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 04/14 3:07 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/14/2025, re:155 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Complaint [Docket No.135 ] is DENIED . (dgumb, )
Related: [-]