Original Case: 1:18-cv-00756

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-01388
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2019
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 5:44 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER
Represented By
Paige Arrants
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Edward James Gorman
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Joshua L. Roberts
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL HANCOCK
Represented By
Paige Arrants
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Edward James Gorman
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Joshua L. Roberts
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PATRICK FIRMAN
Represented By
Paige Arrants
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Edward James Gorman
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Joshua L. Roberts
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JESS VIGIL
Represented By
Paige Arrants
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Edward James Gorman
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Joshua L. Roberts
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREA ALBO
Represented By
Paige Arrants
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Edward James Gorman
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Joshua L. Roberts
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Renee A. Goble
Office of the Denver City Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LISA CALDERON
Represented By
Patricia S. Bangert
Patricia S. Bangert, Attorney at Law
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2021
[10818494] Reversed and Remnded;Terminated on the merits after oral hearing;Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Matheson, Briscoe and Murphy (authoring). Mandate to issue. [19-1388]

Docket last updated: 03/31/2021 5:44 AM MDT
Thursday, October 17, 2019
[10687869] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/17/2018. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/31/2019 for Lisa Calderon. Notice of appearance due on 10/31/2019 for Andrea Albo, City and County of Denver, Patrick Firman, Michael Hancock and Jess Vigil. 19-1388
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil