Cruickshank v. Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Melvin S Hoffman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01039 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc.
1970 Oakcrest Ave Suite 217
Roseville, MN 55113 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary W. Cruickshank
21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 08/20 9:31 AM
Disposition of Adversary No. 18-1039 Complaint Dismissed by Stipulation. (Telam, Usbc) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/20 9:34 AM
Adversary Case 18-1039 Closed. (Telam, Usbc) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/08 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/05 3:39 PM
Endorsed Order dated 8/5/2019 Re:25 Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. and Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC of Dismissal. APPROVED. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/19 2:34 PM
Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. and Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC of Dismissal. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Sunday, August 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 08/27 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/26/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Approval
Fri 08/24 3:40 PM
Endorsed Order dated 8/24/2018 Re:18 Motion filed by Chapter 7 Trustee for Entry of Order Approving Re:17 Stipulation] Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. ALLOWED. NO OBJECTIONS FILED. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 08/14 9:40 AM
Endorsed Order dated 8/14/2018 Re:21 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:15 Pre-Trial Order]. ALLOWED. ALL DEADLINES ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THE SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. (ml) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Time
Mon 08/13 11:18 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:15 Pre-Trial Order]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/30 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
19 | 19
court
Notice of Objection Deadline - All (JNF form 3)
Mon 07/30 3:41 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline Set Objections due by 8/23/2018 at 04:30 PM. . (Telam, Usbc) |
|
18 | 18
6
pgs
motion
Approve
Mon 07/30 11:41 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve [Re:17 Stipulation]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
17 | 17
5
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/30 11:40 AM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc., and Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 07/06 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 07/05/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
order
Pre-Trial Order
Tue 07/03 8:28 AM
Pre-Trial Order dated 7/2/2018 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank. Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 11/29/2018. Discovery due by 10/1/2018. See Order for Full Text. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
10
pgs
answer
Amended Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/29 5:17 PM
Amended Answer filed by Defendants Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc., Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC Re:6 Amended Complaint by Kathleen R. Cruickshank on behalf of Gary W. Cruickshank against Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC, Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. Re:1 Adversary case 18-01039 (Theodore, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 06/18 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael H. Theodore with certificate of service filed by Defendants Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc., Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC (Theodore, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/13 10:42 AM
Summons Service Executed on Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC 6/8/2018 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Saturday, June 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 06/10 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/09/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Summons Issued
Thu 06/07 3:27 PM
Summons Issued on Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC Answer Due 7/5/2018. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (ml) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Thu 06/07 3:25 PM
Endorsed Order dated 6/7/2018 Re:7 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank for Entry of Order: (1) Authorizing Trustee to Amend Complaint [Re: 6 Amended Complaint; (2) Directing the Issuance of an Additional Summons; (3) Setting a Deadline for Defendants to Answer Amended Complaint. ALLOWED. (ml) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/04 6:22 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
motion
Amend
Mon 06/04 6:21 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank for Entry of Order: (1) Authorizing Trustee to Amend Complaint [Re:6 Amended Complaint; (2) Directing the Issuance of an Additional Summons; (3) Setting a Deadline for Defendants to Answer Amended Complaint. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
6 | 6
17
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/04 6:21 PM
Amended Complaint by Kathleen R. Cruickshank on behalf of Gary W. Cruickshank against Northpoint Commercial Credit, LLC, Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. Re:1 Adversary case 18-01039 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 04/26 8:23 AM
Endorsed Order dated 4/25/2018 Re:4 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to Answer Re:1 Complaint. ALLOWED. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extend Time
Wed 04/25 4:20 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 04/05 11:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. 4/4/2018 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
court
Summons Issued
Tue 04/03 2:33 PM
Summons Issued on Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc. Answer Due 5/3/2018. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/03 12:07 PM
Adversary case 18-01039 Complaint by Gary W. Cruickshank against Dedicated Commercial Recovery, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(Cruickshank, Kathleen) |