Nine West Apparel Holdings LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10947
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10947
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10951 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nine West Apparel Holdings LLC
1411 Broadway
New York, NY 10018-3496 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 02/27 9:45 AM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order, Final Decree
Tue 02/04 12:14 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases signed on 2/4/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 04/24 9:27 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Leon B Gordon on behalf of Hays County et al. (Gordon, Leon) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 04/10 9:45 AM
Case Joint Administration. All further pleadings, docket entries and other papers shall be filed in the Lead Case No. 18-10947 (SCC). (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 04/09 3:05 PM
Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief signed on 4/9/2018 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 04/06 3:51 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Nine West Apparel Holdings LLC with hearing to be held on 4/9/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Sprayregen, James) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 04/06 2:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Nine West Apparel Holdings LLC. (Sprayregen, James) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Fri 04/06 2:31 PM
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 04/06 2:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10951 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12515408. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |