Nine West Distribution LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10947
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10947
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10954 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nine West Distribution LLC
180 Rittenhouse Cir
Bristol, PA 19007-1618 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order, Final Decree
Tue 03/31 12:39 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases signed on 3/31/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 03/31 2:31 PM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 04/09 3:06 PM
Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief signed on 4/9/2018 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 04/09 4:54 PM
Case Jointly Administered. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the jointadministration of the chapter 11 cases of: Nine West Holdings, Inc.; Jasper Parent LLC; Kasper Group LLC; Kasper U.S. Blocker LLC; Nine West Apparel Holdings LLC; Nine West Development LLC; Nine West Distribution LLC; Nine West Jeanswear HoldingLLC; Nine West Management Service LLC; One Jeanswear Group Inc.; and US KIC Top Hat LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Lead Bankruptcy Case No. 18-10947 SCC). (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
17
pgs
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 04/06 3:53 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Nine West Distribution LLC with hearing to be held on 4/9/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Sprayregen, James) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 04/06 2:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by James H.M. Sprayregen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Nine West Distribution LLC. (Sprayregen, James) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Fri 04/06 2:31 PM
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 04/06 2:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10954 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12515419. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |