Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:18-ap-03018
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2018
Terminated:Oct 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keith Burchett
59 Hide Away Circle
Cub Run, KY 42729
Represented By
Keith Burchett
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
court Close Case -AP Thu 10/01 6:14 AM
Case Closed. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 09/19 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 PDF Notice Request to defendant regarding (related document(s)34 Order Granting Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. (Related Doc29 ) Entered on 9/16/2020.).
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
35 35 notice PDF Notice Request-Selected Parties Wed 09/16 9:44 AM
PDF Notice Request to defendant regarding Related [+]. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 34 Order Granting Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. (Related Doc29 ) Entered on 9/16/2020.
34 34 order Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/16 9:43 AM
Order Granting Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. Related [+] Entered on 9/16/2020. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, August 14, 2020
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 08/15 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order of the Court CHANGING the hearing scheduled on 9/15/2020 to a TELEPHONIC hearing regarding the Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC filed by Creditor Ray Ragland29 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Stout. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) by TELEPHONE. Parties to call in at 1-888-684-8852 and use the Access Code 2390218#. Parties are to use the prompt to bypass the security code. Parties are directed to put their call on mute until their case is called. (Graham, S) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
32 32 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Wed 08/12 7:04 AM
Order of the Court CHANGING the hearing scheduled on 9/15/2020 to a TELEPHONIC hearing regarding the Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC filed by Creditor Ray Ragland29 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Stout. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) by TELEPHONE. Parties to call in at 1-888-684-8852 and use the Access Code 2390218#. Parties are to use the prompt to bypass the security code. Parties are directed to put their call on mute until their case is called. (Graham, S)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 01, 2020
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 08/02 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Notice of Hearing regarding Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland29 . ANY OBJECTION TO THE MOTION HEREIN SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF HEARING. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. cc: parties of record.
Thursday, July 30, 2020
30 30 notice Hearing(Document) Thu 07/30 10:20 AM
Notice of Hearing regarding Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland29 . ANY OBJECTION TO THE MOTION HEREIN SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF HEARING. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #3, 5th Fl. (6th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. cc: parties of record. (Graham, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/29 12:29 PM
Motion for Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Interest in Comstar, LLC. Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
28 28 order Reopen Case Tue 07/28 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Case for the limited purpose of enforcing the charging order entered in this case and foreclosing Keith Burchett's member interest in ComStar LL Related [+] Entered on 7/28/2020. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 27
Thursday, July 23, 2020
27 27 motion Reopen Case Thu 07/23 12:13 PM
Motion to Reopen Case . Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
26 26 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/30 1:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael V. Brodarick . Filed by on behalf of Ray Ragland (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
court Close Case -AP Thu 06/11 7:38 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
25 25 order Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/26 2:18 PM
Order Granting Application for Charging Orde Related [+] Entered on 5/26/2020. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Thu 05/07 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 PDF Notice Request to Pro Se Defendant regarding (related documents- Order to Extend Time22 , Order (Miscellaneous Relief)). (related document(s)22 Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Keith Burchett to file Objections to 16 up to and including May 16, 2020. (related document(s)21 Agreed Motion Proposed Agreed Order filed by Creditor Ray Ragland). Objections due by 5/16/2020. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. Entered on 5/4/2020).
Monday, May 04, 2020
23 23 notice PDF Notice Request-Selected Parties Mon 05/04 1:04 PM
PDF Notice Request to Pro Se Defendant regarding Related [+].. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] - Order to Extend Time22 , Order (Miscellaneous Relief)22 Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Keith Burchett to file Objections to 16 up to and including May 16, 2020. (related document(s)21 Agreed Motion Proposed Agreed Order filed by Creditor Ray Ragland). Objections due by 5/16/2020. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. Entered on 5/4/2020
22 22 order Extend/Shorten/Waive Time (Adversary) Mon 05/04 1:03 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Keith Burchett to file Objections to 16 up to and including May 16, 2020. Related [+]. Objections due by 5/16/2020. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. Entered on 5/4/2020 (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 21 Agreed Motion Proposed Agreed Order filed by Creditor Ray Ragland
Friday, May 01, 2020
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/01 8:42 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Keith Burchett to file Objections to16 up to and including May 16, 2020. Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland (Hayes, Bryan) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Sat 04/18 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)16 Motion Application for Charging Order Against and Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Transferable Interest in ComStar, LLC filed by Creditor Ray Ragland). Objections due by 5/6/2020. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
19 19 notice Objections Wed 04/15 2:11 PM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 5/6/2020. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 16 Motion Application for Charging Order Against and Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Transferable Interest in ComStar, LLC filed by Creditor Ray Ragland
18 18 order Reopen Case Wed 04/15 1:57 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Case Related [+] Entered on 4/15/2020. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
17 17 motion Reopen Case Tue 04/14 1:55 PM
Motion to Reopen Case . Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland (Hayes, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order (re-opening)
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/14 1:11 PM
Motion Application for Charging Order Against and Foreclosure of Keith Burchett's Transferable Interest in ComStar, LLC. Filed by Creditor Ray Ragland (Hayes, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Assignment of Default Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit ComStar
Att: 3 Exhibit KRS 275.260
Att: 4 Proposed Order Charging Order
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
15 15 misc Document (Generic) Wed 09/05 12:35 PM
Document- Affidavit for Writ of Non-Wage Garnishment. Filed by Michael E. Wheatley (Hall, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
court Close Case -AP Wed 06/13 10:21 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 06/01 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Keith Burchett(Related Doc10 ) Entered on 5/29/2018.
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
13 13 order Default Judgment - Entered by the Court Tue 05/29 11:15 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Keith Burchet Related [+] Entered on 5/29/2018. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 10
Saturday, May 26, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 05/27 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for June 5, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03018 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24188758,'Wheatley_v_Burchett',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference rescheduled for 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 05/27 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant (related document(s)7 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant, Keith Burchett filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley).
Friday, May 25, 2018
10 10 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Court - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(2) Fri 05/25 1:56 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Keith Burchett. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Default Judgment
Thursday, May 24, 2018
9 9 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 05/24 3:11 PM
Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for June 5, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03018 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24188758,'Wheatley_v_Burchett',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference rescheduled for 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/24 7:56 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant, Keith Burchett filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
7 7 motion Default - Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(a) Wed 05/23 4:35 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant, Keith Burchett. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Entry of Default
Thursday, April 12, 2018
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/12 3:10 PM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Keith Burchett on April 12, 2018. (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/11 9:46 AM
Summons Service Executed on Keith Burchett on April 11, 2018. (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Wed 04/11 7:48 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 18-3018 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Wed 04/11 7:47 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Keith Burchett Answer Due 5/11/2018.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM EASTERN TIME at Telephonic Hearing. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
2 2 motion Defer Fee Tue 04/10 3:33 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint To Avoid Fraudulent Conveyances by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Keith Burchett. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/10 3:28 PM
Adversary case 18-03018 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint To Avoid Fraudulent Conveyances by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Keith Burchett. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C