Wheatley v. Ragland
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239
Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joan A Lloyd |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03019 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Janet Ragland
1796 Owensboro Road
Leithfield, KY 42754 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
court
Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid
Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M) |
||
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
court
Close Case -AP
Thu 12/27 2:41 PM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 11/02/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Entered on 10/31/2018. (Preston, T) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement Entered on 10/25/2018. (Preston, T) |
|
Saturday, October 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 10/20/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference held on October 18, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03019 Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Janet Ragland1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 12/20/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections . Notice Date 10/05/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice for Objections regarding . Objections due by 10/24/2018. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Sunday, July 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 07/22/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference set for July 19, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03019 Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Janet Ragland.1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Janet Ragland (Stosberg, Andrew) |
|
Saturday, June 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 06/16/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference set July 12, 2018 in Adversary case 18-03019 Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Janet Ragland.1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Reassigning Case to Another Judge. Involvement of Judge Joan A. Lloyd Terminated. Judge Thomas H. Fulton added to case. The pre-trial conferences presently scheduled on July 12, 2018 will be rescheduled to the docket of the Honorable Thomas H. Fulton by separate notice. Entered on 6/13/2018 (Pierce, M) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 06/04 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew David Stosberg . Filed by on behalf of Janet Ragland (Stosberg, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on June 4, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03019 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214745,'Wheatley_v_Ragland',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/12/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 06/01 12:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew David Stosberg . Filed by on behalf of Alliance Management Services, Inc. (Stosberg, Andrew) |
|
Saturday, May 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request . Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for June 5, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03019 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214745,'Wheatley_v_Ragland',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed on Janet Ragland on April 13, 2018. (Larson, Keith) |
|
4 | 4
vorder
Defer Fee - AP
Fri 04/13 7:33 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 18-3019 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Pierce, M) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Janet Ragland Answer Due 5/14/2018.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM EASTERN TIME at Telephonic Hearing. (Pierce, M) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Application to Defer Fee for AP . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-03019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Janet Ragland. (Bordy, Neil) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |