Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:18-ap-03021
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2018
Terminated:Oct 24, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Comstar LLC
Serve: Registered Agent, Janet Ragland 59 Hide Away Circle
Cub Run, KY 42729
Represented By
Comstar LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
court Close Case -AP Wed 10/24 7:14 AM
Case Closed. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
23 23 order Settlement Agreement Tue 10/09 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement Related [+] Entered on 10/9/2018. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 20
Sunday, September 16, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Mon 09/17 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 09/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)20 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley). Objections due by 10/5/2018. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Friday, September 14, 2018
21 21 notice Objections Fri 09/14 10:14 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 10/5/2018. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Thursday, September 13, 2018
20 20 motion Approve Settlement Thu 09/13 1:01 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, July 22, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 07/23 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley2 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. ). Notice Date 07/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference held on July 19, 2018 regarding Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Friday, July 20, 2018
18 18 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Fri 07/20 1:26 PM
Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference held on July 19, 2018 regarding Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley). Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley2 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
17 17 misc Interrogatories Thu 07/19 4:26 PM
Interrogatories Request for Production of Documents and Admissions . Filed by Comstar LLC (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/17 12:14 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Comstar LLC (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 15, 2018
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sun 07/15 5:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael V. Brodarick . Filed by on behalf of Comstar LLC (Brodarick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 16, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 06/17 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 06/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference set for July 12, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, June 14, 2018
13 13 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 06/14 4:52 PM
Order of the Court to continue pre-trial conference set for July 12, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Fulton. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #2, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
12 12 order Reassigning Case to a Different Judge Wed 06/13 4:26 PM
Order Reassigning Case to Another Judge. Involvement of Judge Joan A. Lloyd Terminated. Judge Thomas H. Fulton added to case. The pre-trial conferences presently scheduled on July 12, 2018 will be rescheduled to the docket of the Honorable Thomas H. Fulton by separate notice. Entered on 6/13/2018 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Thu 06/07 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on June 4, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214747,'Wheatley_v_Comstar_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/12/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Monday, June 04, 2018
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 06/04 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew David Stosberg . Filed by on behalf of Comstar LLC (Stosberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Mon 06/04 2:34 PM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on June 4, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214747,'Wheatley_v_Comstar_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/12/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/01 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew David Stosberg . Filed by on behalf of Alliance Management Services, Inc. (Stosberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 26, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 05/27 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for June 5, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214747,'Wheatley_v_Comstar_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, May 24, 2018
6 6 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 05/24 3:16 PM
Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for June 5, 2018 on Adversary case 18-03021 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(24214747,'Wheatley_v_Comstar_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/13 9:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on Comstar LLC on April 13, 2018. (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Fri 04/13 7:29 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 18-3021 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Fri 04/13 7:28 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Comstar LLC Answer Due 5/14/2018.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 6/5/2018 at 01:30 PM EASTERN TIME at Telephonic Hearing. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
2 2 motion Defer Fee Thu 04/12 4:09 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/12 4:05 PM
Adversary case 18-03021 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Comstar LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A