Earl Crosby, et al v. Twitter, Inc., et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-14406
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01426 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2019 3:37 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GOOGLE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FACEBOOK, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TWITTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NICHOLAZ PEREZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIA C. SANFELIZ-MENDOZA, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Christopher Joseph Sanfeliz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGEL MENDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTINE LEINONEN, Individually and as Proposed Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Christopher Leinonen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER LEINONEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF STANLEY ALMODOVAR, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JILLIAN AMADOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STANLEY ALMODOVAR, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Stanley Almodovar, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ASAEL ABAD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF LUIS SERGIO VIELMA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LYDIA PEREZ, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Jean Carlos Mendez Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALVIN MENDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSE LUIS VIELMA, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Luis Sergio Vielma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH SANFELIZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACKSON J. JOSAPHAT, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Jason B. Josaphat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLOS SANFELIZ, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Christopher Joseph Sanfeliz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
YAZMIN REYES, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Javier Jorge-Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF TEVIN EUGENE CROSBY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LISA CROSBY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHENETRA PARKER-HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHAVIS CROSBY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CELIA RUIZ, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Juan Ramon Guerrero, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JUAN RAMON GUERRERO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUAN RAMON GUERRERO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MAYA GUERRERO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ARYAM GUERRERO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
OSVALDO VAZQUEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EARL CROSBY, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest of the Estate of Tevin Eugene Crosby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JAVIER JORGE-REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PEDRO JORGE DIAZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
IRIS REYES SANTIAGO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PEDRO JORGE REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GABRIEL JORGE REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LIZ M. JORGE-REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRIS LITTLESTAR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JASON B. JOSAPHAT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF JEAN CARLOS MENDEZ PEREZ
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 16 2019
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Decision for publication. Gilbert S. Merritt, Julia Smith Gibbons, and John B. Nalbandian (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges. |
Docket last updated: 04/19/2019 3:37 AM CDT |