Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01180
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Sep 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ally Financial Inc., a Foreign Banking Institution,
Represented By
Ally Financial Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/18 11:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1180 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/03 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Sunday, July 29, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/30 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/29/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Settlement) .
Friday, July 27, 2018
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/27 4:43 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Settlement) . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Thu 07/12 2:41 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy with Ally Financial Inc. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/30 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/30 11:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on Ally Financial Inc. 4/30/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Ally Financial Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 12:58 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 12:57 PM
Summons Issued on Ally Financial Inc. Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 11:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
Thursday, April 26, 2018
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 04/26 8:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 5:45 PM
Adversary case 18-01180 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against Ally Financial Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]