Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-bk-16004
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jul 13, 2016
Claims Deadline:Aug 30, 2016
Terminated:Mar 28, 2022

Debtor
Indeco Finishes of Florida, LLC
Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee Attn: Alexis S. Read, Esq. 555 N.E. 15th Steet, Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jacqueline Calderin
247 SW 8 St # 880
Miami, FL 33130
Trustee
Marcia T Dunn
555 NE 15 St, Ste 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Tyler A Stull
Conrad & Scherer LLP
contact info
Marcia T Dunn
contact info
Michael P Dunn
contact info
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Barry Seth Turner, Esq.
Barry S. Turner P.A.
contact info
Jonathan S. Feldman
Phang & Feldman, P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 12:17 AM EST
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
1 1 7 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 Meeting of Creditors to be held on 06/01/2016 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. Proofs of Claim due by 08/30/2016. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
3 3 Ex Parte Motion for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee, Or in the Alternative, Defer Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee [cal] Filed by Debtor Indeco Finishes of Florida, LLC. Related [+] Modified on 4/27/2016 to Edit Text.(Valencia, Yamileth).
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order