Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01182
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Feb 14, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc., a Foreign Profit Corporation
Represented By
Verizon Communications, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, February 14, 2019
34 34 court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/14 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1182 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
33 33 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 01/08 1:23 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
32 32 attydoc Notice to Withdraw Appearance or Substitute Attorney Fri 11/09 11:23 AM
Notice to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., and VERIZON WIRELESS OF THE EAST, LP by Attorney Barbara L Phillips. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
31 31 notice Notice of Filing Wed 09/19 12:18 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy with Verizon Communication, Inc. and Verizon Wireless of the East, LP. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
30 30 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Tue 09/11 2:43 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 27 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defense and Motion to Strike 23 Answer to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Stull, Tyler) Modified on 8/17/2018 to Add Verbiage. filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
Friday, August 17, 2018
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/17 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
28 28 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 08/17 9:05 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2018 at 03:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
Thursday, August 16, 2018
27 27 motion Strike Thu 08/16 4:45 PM
Motion to Strike 23 Answer to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
26 26 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 08/15 10:33 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Defendant Verizon Wireless of the East, LP. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/15 10:31 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Verizon Wireless of the East, LP. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 08/15 10:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Barbara L Phillips Filed by Defendant Verizon Wireless of the East, LP. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/26 11:42 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
22 22 attydoc Notice of Filing Tue 07/24 11:49 AM
Notice of Filing Verizon Communications, Inc's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Attorney Barbara L Phillips Related [+]. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.,12 Notice of Hearing
Monday, July 23, 2018
21 21 answer Response Mon 07/23 2:26 PM
Response to (10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/18 6:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,16 Amended Summons Issued,17 Order Setting Requirements
19 19 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/18 5:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Verizon Wireless of the East, LP 7/18/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Verizon Wireless of the East, LP. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/18 5:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Verizon Communications, Inc. 7/17/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
17 17 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 07/17 4:59 PM
Amended Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Amended Summons Issued Tue 07/17 4:58 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Verizon Communications, Inc. Answer Due 8/16/2018; Verizon Wireless of the East, LP Answer Due 8/16/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/03/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
Monday, July 16, 2018
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/16 7:00 PM
Amended Complaint by Marcia Dunn against all defendants. Complaint Amended to add Verizon Wireless of the East, LP as a party. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Transfers
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Tue 06/26 2:15 PM
Notice of Filing Rule 7007.1 Corporate Ownership Statement , Filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
13 13 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 06/25 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Barbara L Phillips Related [+]. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.,12 Notice of Hearing
12 12 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 06/25 2:02 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2018 at 11:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.
11 11 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Mon 06/25 1:55 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Pretrial Conference Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Related [+] (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 06/25 1:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 06/25 11:09 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Barbara L Phillips Filed by Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Phillips, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
8 8 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/18 5:19 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/01 10:54 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/01 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Verizon Communications, Inc. 5/1/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 2:18 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 2:18 PM
Summons Issued on Verizon Communications, Inc. Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 12:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 5:49 PM
Adversary case 18-01182 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against Verizon Communications, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]