Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01190
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Feb 14, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Discover Financial Services, LLC, as affiliate of DISCOVER BANK, a Foreign Limited Liability Company,
Represented By
Discover Financial Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, February 14, 2019
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/14 11:20 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1190 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
22 22 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 11/26 2:57 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Wed 09/19 12:16 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy with Discover Financial Services, LLC. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 01, 2018
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/02 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial, Setting Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn). Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/02 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Agreed Order on Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. (Re:14 )
Friday, June 29, 2018
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/29 11:18 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC Related [+]. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/29 11:17 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC Related [+]. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Extend Time
16 16 5 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Fri 06/29 9:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial, Setting Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. Related [+]. Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
15 15 order Extend Time Order Fri 06/29 8:28 AM
Agreed Order on Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #14
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
14 14 motion Extend Time Tue 06/19 3:29 PM
Second Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to July 9, 2018 Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
13 13 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/18 5:11 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 02, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/03 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Agreed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to theComplaint. (Re:9 )
Thursday, May 31, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/31 4:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC Related [+]. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
10 10 order Extend Time Order Thu 05/31 4:01 PM
Agreed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to theComplaint. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #9
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
9 9 motion Extend Time Tue 05/29 2:46 PM
Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to June 12, 2018 Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 05/29 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Jonathan M Sykes Filed by Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/30 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/30 3:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Discover Financial Services, LLC 4/30/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant Discover Financial Services, LLC. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 2:50 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 2:49 PM
Summons Issued on Discover Financial Services, LLC Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 12:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 10:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 6:15 PM
Adversary case 18-01190 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against Discover Financial Services, LLC. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]