Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01194
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Nov 09, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
OK Feed & Supply, Inc., a Florida Profit Corporation,
Represented By
OK Feed & Supply, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, November 09, 2018
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/09 8:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1194 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 09/17 2:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
9 9 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Mon 07/09 10:06 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Pretrial Conference Scheduled for July 16, 2018 - 9019 Motion Filed Related [+] (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, June 08, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Fri 06/08 3:21 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Compromise Controversy with OK Feed & Supply, Inc. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/01 8:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/01 8:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on OK Feed & Supply, Inc. 5/1/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant OK Feed & Supply, Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 3:17 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on OK Feed & Supply, Inc. Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 6:42 PM
Adversary case 18-01194 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against OK Feed & Supply, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]