Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-16004

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:18-ap-01196
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2018
Terminated:Jan 08, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc., a not-for-profit Florida Corporation
Represented By
The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Tyler A Stull
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Alexis S Read
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael P Dunn
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/08 6:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1196 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 12/20 2:24 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
16 16 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Fri 09/07 11:47 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Final Pre-Trial Hearing. 9019 Motion Filed in Lead Case Related [+] (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Friday, August 17, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/17 3:30 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee's Motion to Compromise Controversy with The Ivy Condominium Association , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 15, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/16 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Motion To Continue Pretrial Hearing and to Continue All Related Pretrial Deadlines On: (1 Complaint). Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, July 13, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/13 3:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
12 12 order Continue Hearing Order Fri 07/13 1:44 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Pretrial Hearing and to Continue All Related Pretrial Deadlines On: (1 Complaint). Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
11 11 motion Continue Hearing Wed 07/11 7:11 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order
10 10 misc Document Wed 07/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Disclosure Filed by Defendant The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc.. (Conrad, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 07/11 11:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Thomas A. Conrad Filed by Defendant The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc.. (Conrad, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
8 8 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 06/18 5:15 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/01 9:47 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn Related [+]. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn,4 Summons Issued,5 Order Setting Requirements
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/01 9:45 AM
Summons Service Executed on The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc. 5/1/2018 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendant The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc.. (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 04/27 3:24 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/27 3:23 PM
Summons Issued on The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc. Answer Due 5/29/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/16/2018 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 12:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. Related [+]
Related: [-] ad, Alexis
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 04/27 11:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/26 7:14 PM
Adversary case 18-01196 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against The Ivy Condominium Association, Inc.. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Stull, Tyler)
Related: [-]